MA S697 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2917
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to insurance coverage for mammograms and breast cancer screening. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to insurance coverage for mammograms and breast cancer screening
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Lovely [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Jessica Giannino [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Sen. Susan Moran [D] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2917 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2022-04-21 | House | House concurred |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday April 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1153 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S648
H1043 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S726 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2856
S668 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S700
S1759 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2917 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1175 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5313
H1040 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
H1043 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S726 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2856
S668 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied S700
S1759 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2917 (Replaced by) 2022-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1175 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5313
H1040 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S697 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S697.pdf |