MA S774 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to probation violations. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to probation violations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2017-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1105 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2440
S1013 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2448
S772 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S934 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1955 (Similar To) 2017-11-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1798 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H2287 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1117 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1860 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1864 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1013 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2448
S772 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S934 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1955 (Similar To) 2017-11-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1798 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H2287 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1117 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1860 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1864 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S774 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S774.pdf |