MA S787 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2499
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2499
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2499
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to freedom of speech and association. The Judiciary.
Title
To protect fundamental freedoms and prohibit discriminatory registration programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2499 |
2018-04-02 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 2, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | House | House concurred |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday, March 21, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1466 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1364 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1304 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S890 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S828 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1369 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S974 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1743 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4679
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H2487 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
S2499 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1364 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1304 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S890 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S828 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1369 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S974 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H1743 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4679
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H2487 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
S2499 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S787 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S787.pdf |