MA S797 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Massachusetts Rental Voucher Program. Housing.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts Rental Voucher Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-07-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H1257 (Similar To) 2020-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5001
H2271 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1275 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4942
H1265 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2271 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1275 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4942
H1265 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S797 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S797.pdf |