MA S858 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to preventing discrimination on the basis of sex, sexual orientation, and gender identity by educational institutions. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to preventing discrimination on the basis of sex, sexual orientation, and gender identity by educational institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2496 |
2019-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3070 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H110 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
S70 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H140
H1504 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1427 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
H140 (Similar To) 2019-04-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2019
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H110 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
S70 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H140
H1504 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1427 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
H140 (Similar To) 2019-04-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2019
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S858 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S858.pdf |