MA S896 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Massachusetts Uniform Trust Decanting Act. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts Uniform Trust Decanting Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2496 |
2019-09-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S2106 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H1220 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H1655 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S1490 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S1636 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S333 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S970 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2347 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2003 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H1220 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H1655 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S1490 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S1636 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S333 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S970 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H2347 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2003 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S2421 (Similar To) 2020-07-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S896 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S896.pdf |