MD HB571 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying provisions of law governing application, administration, and enforcement of the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program, including provisions related to the payment of contributions, the calculation of the average weekly wage, the submission of claims for benefits, the application of the Program to self-employed individuals, the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Fund, the satisfaction of Program requirements through private employer plans or insurance, and the use of contributions or other funding.
Title
Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Modifications
Sponsors
Del. Lily Qi [D] | Del. Adrian Boafo [D] | Del. Diana Fennell [D] | Del. Linda Foley [D] |
Del. Andre Johnson [D] | Del. Aaron Kaufman [D] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] | Del. Edith Patterson [D] |
Del. Andrew Pruski [D] | Del. Gary Simmons [D] | Del. Deni Taveras [D] | Del. Chao Wu [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267 |
2024-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-13) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-39) |
2024-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {993225/1 Adopted |
2024-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2024-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB485 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Subjects
Appeals
Awareness and Outreach
Budgets
Claims
complaints
Corporations
Data
Education
Electronic Documents
Fees
Forms
Grants
Insurance
Labor, Department of
Leave
Notices
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Awareness and Outreach
Budgets
Claims
complaints
Corporations
Data
Education
Electronic Documents
Fees
Forms
Grants
Insurance
Labor, Department of
Leave
Notices
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 3 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |