MD SB485 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying provisions of law governing application, administration, and enforcement of the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program, including provisions related to the payment of contributions, the calculation of the average weekly wage, the submission of claims for benefits, the application of the Program to self-employed individuals, the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Fund, the satisfaction of Program requirements through private employer plans or insurance, and the use of contributions or other funding by the Secretary of Labor.
Title
Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-36) |
2024-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-11) |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {503824/1 Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 11:00 a.m. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB571 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Subjects
Appeals
Claims
complaints
Corporations
Data
Electronic Documents
Fees
Forms
Grants
Insurance
Labor, Department of
Notices
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Claims
complaints
Corporations
Data
Electronic Documents
Fees
Forms
Grants
Insurance
Labor, Department of
Notices
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 3 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 906 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |