MD HB895 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership and duties of the Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program; and changing the date from December 30, 2015, to December 30, 2016, by which the Task Force is required to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and to specified committees of the General Assembly.
Title
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program - Membership, Duties, and Extension
Sponsors
Del. Anne Kaiser [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2016-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {745365/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Education
Grants
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Special Education
Students
Sunset
Disabilities
Education
Grants
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
Special Education
Students
Sunset