MN HF1434 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Author added Erickson.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Author added Erickson.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Firearm suppressor possession and use prohibition repealed, chief law enforcement officers required to complete federal certifications relating to suppressors in a timely manner, and appeal process for denial of certification provided.
Title
Firearm suppressor possession and use prohibition repealed, chief law enforcement officers required to complete federal certifications relating to suppressors in a timely manner, and appeal process for denial of certification provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Anderson [R] | Rep. David Dill [D] | Rep. Tony Cornish [R] | Rep. Jason Metsa [D] |
Rep. Chris Swedzinski [R] | Sen. Jason Rarick [R] | Rep. Tom Anzelc [D] | Rep. Dan Fabian [R] |
Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Rep. Jim Newberger [R] |
Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] |
Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Brian Johnson [R] |
Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] | Rep. Bob Loonan [R] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] |
Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Bob Vogel [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Sondra Erickson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House: Passage (Y: 89 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 45 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 42 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 45 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Amendment to Amendment (Y: 42 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Author added Erickson. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-04-16 | House | Bill was passed vote: 89-40 |
2015-04-16 | House | Third reading |
2015-04-16 | House | Amendments offered |
2015-04-15 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 16, 2015 |
2015-03-16 | House | Author added Backer. |
2015-03-16 | House | Second reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2015-03-12 | House | Author added Vogel. |
2015-03-09 | House | Authors added Kiel and Garofalo. |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1435 (Similar To) 2015-03-05 - Referred to Judiciary