MN SF1509 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 159 04/11/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 159 04/11/14
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cesar Chavez day designation
Title
Cesar Chavez day designation
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Torres Ray [D] | Sen. John Marty [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 83 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - House: (Y: 125 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - House: (Y: 125 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 159 04/11/14 | |
2014-04-22 | Governor's action Approval 04/11/14 | |
2014-04-11 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2014-04-11 | Governor approval | |
2014-04-09 | Presented to Governor | |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Returned from House |
2014-04-07 | House | Bill was passed vote: 83-45 |
2014-04-07 | House | Third reading |
2014-04-07 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2014-04-07 | House | Amendments offered |
2014-04-03 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 7, 2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | Second reading |
2014-04-01 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Author added Marty |
2014-03-31 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1631 |
2014-03-31 | House | Received from Senate |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 57-1 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Special Order |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Second reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |