MN SF200 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF447, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF447, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Judiciary Policy Provisions
Title
Judiciary Policy Provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Latz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF447, SF indefinitely postponed |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF447 (Similar To) 2023-05-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 73