MN SF2392 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Secretary of State Chapter 235 04/27/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Secretary of State Chapter 235 04/27/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus liquor provisions modification
Title
Omnibus liquor provisions modification
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Gerlach [R] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Joe Hoppe [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-23 - House - Repassage (Y: 115 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 107 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - House - Amendment (Y: 21 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-30 - House - Amendment (Y: 25 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-30 - House - Passage, as amended (Y: 107 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - House - Amendment (Y: 21 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-30 - House - Amendment (Y: 25 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | Secretary of State Chapter 235 04/27/12 | |
2012-04-27 | Governor's action Approval 04/27/12 | |
2012-04-24 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2012-04-23 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 115-13 |
2012-04-23 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2012-04-23 | House | House adopted conference committee report |
2012-04-23 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2012-04-23 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 55-3 |
2012-04-20 | Senate | Third reading vote: 55-3 |
2012-04-20 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2012-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2012-04-03 | House | House conferees Atkins; Anderson, S.; Hoppe; Sanders; Lillie |
2012-04-03 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed |
2012-04-03 | House | Senate conferees Gerlach; Michel; Hall; Howe; Reinert |
2012-04-03 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2012-04-03 | Senate | House conferees Atkins; Anderson, S.; Hoppe; Sanders; Lillie |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Senate conferees Gerlach; Michel; Hall; Howe; Reinert |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2012-03-30 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 107-16 |
2012-03-30 | House | Third reading as amended |
2012-03-30 | House | Amended |
2012-03-29 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-03-29 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2012-03-28 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2784 |
2012-03-28 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 58-4 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |