MN SF2851 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Secretary of State Chapter 274 04/26/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Secretary of State Chapter 274 04/26/10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Approved accrediting organization definition modification for hospitals and health care facilities licensing purposes; public health occupations licensing provisions modifications
Title
Approved accrediting organization definition modification for hospitals and health care facilities licensing purposes; public health occupations licensing provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Lynch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Secretary of State Chapter 274 04/26/10 | |
2010-04-28 | Governor's action Approval 04/26/10 | |
2010-04-26 | Governor approval | |
2010-04-22 | Presentment date | |
2010-04-20 | Senate: Returned from House | |
2010-04-19 | House: Bill was passed | |
2010-04-19 | House: Third reading | |
2010-04-15 | House: Second reading | |
2010-04-15 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF subbed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-04-13 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2969 | |
2010-04-13 | House: Received from Senate | |
2010-04-12 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-04-06 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-03-24 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-24 | Senate: Comm report: To pass as amended | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Referred to Health, Housing and Family Security |