MN SF302 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Disclosure of certain payments made to health care providers requirement; all-payer claims data provision modification; transparency of health care payments report requirement
Title
Disclosure of certain payments made to health care providers requirement; all-payer claims data provision modification; transparency of health care payments report requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Mann [D] | Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Paul Utke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Author added Utke |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF926 (Similar To) 2023-02-15 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law