MN SF788 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Body camera recordings prerequisite of pretrial filing of transcript for admission into evidence elimination
Title
Body camera recordings prerequisite of pretrial filing of transcript for admission into evidence elimination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
2017-05-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 67-0 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Special Order |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Author added Schoen |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Author added Hall |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Author added Latz |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1343 (Similar To) 2017-02-16 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance