MO HB2058 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures for asserting a mechanic's lien against certain residential real property
Title
Establishes procedures for asserting a mechanic's lien against certain residential real property
Sponsors
Rep. John Diehl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-07-12 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-14 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 133 NOES: 18 | |
2010-05-14 | House Concurs (H) - SS ADOPTED AYES: 130 NOES: 19 | |
2010-05-13 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SS | |
2010-05-13 | Third Read and Passed (S) - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-05-13 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2010-05-13 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2010-05-13 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-05-11 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-05-10 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-05-06 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-05-04 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-29 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, MAY 4, 2010, 1:30P.M.SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1 | |
2010-04-27 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2010-04-26 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-04-22 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 7 | |
2010-04-21 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED (AYES: 141 NOES: 14) | |
2010-04-21 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2010-04-15 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-15 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-15 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-04-14 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-04-14 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-14 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-14 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-24 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Referred: Insurance Policy (H) | |
2010-02-09 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |