MO HB2058 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-10 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-10 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows any woman who currently serves in any branch of the United States Armed Forces or who was honorably discharged from the service to obtain a "Women Veterans" special license plate
Title
Allows any woman who currently serves in any branch of the United States Armed Forces or who was honorably discharged from the service to obtain a "Women Veterans" special license plate
Sponsors
Rep. Wanda Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-10 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-10 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-04-04 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2012-03-30 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2058&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB2058I.htm |