MO SB1138 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a tax credit for all taxpayers
Title
Authorizes a tax credit for all taxpayers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | S First Read |