MO SB1482 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Missouri Family Trust Company Act
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Missouri Family Trust Company Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | S First Read |