MO SB736 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - Removed S Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - Removed S Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law regarding the collection of taxes
Title
Modifies provisions of law regarding the collection of taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | Removed S Consent Calendar | |
2010-02-11 | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor - Consent | |
2010-02-10 | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - Consent | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Re-referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee | |
2010-01-06 | S First Read--SB 736-McKenna |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3160827 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/pdf-bill/intro/SB736.pdf |