MO SB736 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee
Pending: Senate Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee
Pending: Senate Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to property exempt from attachment and execution in bankruptcy proceedings
Title
Modifies provisions relating to property exempt from attachment and execution in bankruptcy proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 736-Sifton |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26838211 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB736.pdf |