MO SB783 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (4422S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (4422S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a new provision relating to immunity from liability for inherent risks of camping on private campgrounds
Title
Creates a new provision relating to immunity from liability for inherent risks of camping on private campgrounds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (4422S.03C) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 783-Brown |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled |