MO SB786 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee - (5508S.05C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee - (5508S.05C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the State Auditor to audit and compare the costs of death penalty cases and first-degree murder cases in which the death penalty is not sought
Title
Requires the State Auditor to audit and compare the costs of death penalty cases and first-degree murder cases in which the death penalty is not sought
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee - (5508S.05C) | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee | |
2012-02-16 | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee | |
2012-02-13 | S First Read--SB 786-Keaveny |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=1826402 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB786.pdf |