MO SB927 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the maximum insurance coverage that may be offered by self-service storage insurance providers
Title
Increases the maximum insurance coverage that may be offered by self-service storage insurance providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |