NC S133 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Modernize Jury List Procedures
Title
Modernize Jury List Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Motion 9\To Concur (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - A2 Ross\Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - A1 Spear\Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - House - A2 Ross\Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - House - A1 Spear\Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-180 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Ratified | |
2012-06-28 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2012-06-27 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2012-06-27 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-27 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2012-06-26 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-26 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-25 | Postponed To 6/26/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Placed On Cal For 6/25/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-21 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-21 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C | |
2011-03-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-02-28 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2011-02-28 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H535 (Same As) 2011-03-31 - Ref To Com On Government