NH SB403 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the sale or possession of sky lanterns.
Title
Prohibiting the sale or possession of sky lanterns.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. David Borden [D] | Rep. George Sykes [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] |
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Rep. Kathleen Stroud [R] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Rep. Laurie Harding [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 6 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/6/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Hearing:===RESCHEDULED===2/19/14, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing:===CANCELLED===3/5/14, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: ===CANCELLED=== 2/5/14, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |