NJ A3749 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.211.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.211.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes program to provide assistance to qualified veterans in in-patient and out-patient treatment programs to travel to medical counseling in State.*
Title
Establishes program to provide assistance to qualified veterans in in-patient and out-patient treatment programs to travel to medical counseling in State.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2568 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2568 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2568 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2568 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.211. |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (64-0-0) |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Substituted for S2568 (1R) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (30-0) (Beach) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-23 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-09-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2568 (Same As) 2015-07-23 - Substituted by A3749 (1R)