NJ S2568 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2006
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-23 - Substituted by A3749 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-23 - Substituted by A3749 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes program to provide assistance to qualified veterans in in-patient and out-patient treatment programs to travel to medical counseling in State.*
Title
Establishes program to provide assistance to qualified veterans in in-patient and out-patient treatment programs to travel to medical counseling in State.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-23 | Senate | Substituted by A3749 (1R) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (32-0) (Beach) |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2568 (Carry Over) 2015-07-23 - Substituted by A3749 (1R)
A3749 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.211.
A3749 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.211.