NJ A3991 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1625
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S1634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S1634
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires housing authority to advertise when applications are being accepted for housing assistance waiting lists online.
Title
Requires housing authority to advertise when applications are being accepted for housing assistance waiting lists online.
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] |
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S1634 |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1634 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.51.
S1625 (Carry Over) 2015-12-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S1625 (Carry Over) 2015-12-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee