NJ S1634 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1625
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.51.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.51.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires housing authority to advertise when applications are being accepted for housing assistance waiting lists online.
Title
Requires housing authority to advertise when applications are being accepted for housing assistance waiting lists online.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3991 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.51. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A3991 |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1625 (Carry Over) 2015-12-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A3991 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S1634
A3991 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S1634