NJ S1625 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1634
Note: Carry Foward to future A3991
Note: Carry Foward to future A3991
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires housing authority to advertise when applications are being accepted for housing assistance waiting lists on its Internet website or webpage.
Title
Requires housing authority to advertise when applications are being accepted for housing assistance waiting lists on its Internet website or webpage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1625 (Carry Over) 2015-12-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S1625 (Carry Over) 2015-12-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S1625 (Carry Over) 2015-12-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee