NJ S1222 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3260
Note: Carry Foward to future S2197
Note: Carry Over of previous S1027
Note: Carry Over of previous A3595
Note: Carry Foward to future S2197
Note: Carry Over of previous S1027
Note: Carry Over of previous A3595
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Department of Agriculture in consultation with DOE to establish online applications for National School Lunch Program and school breakfast programs.
Title
Directs Department of Agriculture in consultation with DOE to establish online applications for National School Lunch Program and school breakfast programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1222 (Carry Over) 2023-01-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1222 (Carry Over) 2023-01-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A811 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1027 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3595 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1222 (Carry Over) 2023-01-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A811 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1027 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3595 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee