NJ S1271 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S484
Note: Carry Over of previous A5728
Note: Carry Over of previous A5728
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.27.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.27.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements for closures of private career schools and institutions of higher education, modifies review process of new academic programs, and requires approval of branch campuses.
Title
Establishes requirements for closures of private career schools and institutions of higher education, modifies review process of new academic programs, and requires approval of branch campuses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4409 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4409 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.27. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (56-16-2) |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A4409 (ACS/1R) |
2020-11-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1271 (Carry Over) 2021-03-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.27.
A1066 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A5728 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A4409 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Substituted by S1271/2588/2660 (SCS/1R)
A1066 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A5728 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A4409 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Substituted by S1271/2588/2660 (SCS/1R)