NJ S1730 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Approved P.L.2011, c.70.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Approved P.L.2011, c.70.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain public officers and employees to reside in State. *
Title
Requires certain public officers and employees to reside in State. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 70 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-20 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-20 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Approved P.L.2011, c.70. | |
2011-05-09 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-5-1) | |
2011-05-05 | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. | |
2011-03-21 | Passed by the Senate (29-6) | |
2011-02-17 | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (33-4) | |
2011-02-07 | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate | |
2010-12-20 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-10) | |
2010-12-13 | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2010-12-13 | Passed by the Assembly (68-5-1) | |
2010-12-13 | Substituted for A2478 (1R) | |
2010-12-09 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee | |
2010-05-20 | Passed by the Senate (25-10) | |
2010-05-13 | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2478 (Same As) 2010-12-13 - Substituted by S1730 (SCS/1R)