OH HB175 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Effective 7/21/22 - Appropriations effective April 20, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Effective 7/21/22 - Appropriations effective April 20, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3745.114, 5709.09, 6111.01, and 6111.31 and to enact sections 1571.30, 6111.011, 6111.311, 6111.312, 6111.313, 6111.314, 6111.315, and 6111.316 of the Revised Code to deregulate certain ephemeral water features, make other changes to various water pollution control laws, to authorize a property tax exemption for certain private wetlands, and to make an appropriation.
Title
Deregulate certain ephemeral water features
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Effective 7/21/22 - Appropriations effective April 20, 2022 | |
2022-04-06 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Passed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-09-29 | House | Passed |
2021-09-28 | House | Reported - Amended: Agriculture and Conservation |
2021-03-04 | House | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Conservation |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Environment and Natural Resources
Environment and Natural Resources : Air and Water Pollution Control
Environment and Natural Resources : Oil and Gas
Taxation
Environment and Natural Resources : Air and Water Pollution Control
Environment and Natural Resources : Oil and Gas
Taxation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 71 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 45 | 114 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 11 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 11 | 011 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 11 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 11 | 311 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 11 | 312 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 11 | 313 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 11 | 314 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 11 | 315 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 11 | 316 | New Code | See Bill Text |