OH HB312 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-16)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Effective 3/31/21 - Appropriations effective 12/29/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-16)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Effective 3/31/21 - Appropriations effective 12/29/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 145.114, 742.114, 1707.01, 1707.03, 1707.04, 1707.042, 1707.10, 1707.13, 1707.161, 1707.17, 1707.19, 1707.20, 1707.21, 1707.23, 1707.24, 1707.25, 1707.26, 1707.261, 1707.27, 1707.28, 1707.29, 1707.30, 1707.31, 1707.32, 1707.34, 1707.35, 1707.38, 1707.39, 1707.391, 1707.40, 1707.431, 1707.44, 1707.99, 1724.02, 3307.152, 3309.157, 4582.06, 4582.31, and 5505.068 and to enact sections 1707.05, 1707.051, 1707.052, 1707.053, 1707.054, 1707.055, 1707.056, 1707.057, 1707.058, and 1707.50 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 259.50 of H.B. 166 of the 133rd General Assembly to permit intrastate equity crowdfunding under certain circumstances and to make an appropriation.
Title
Permits certain intrastate equity crowdfunding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Effective 3/31/21 - Appropriations effective 12/29/20 | |
2020-12-17 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2020-12-16 | House | Amendments laid over under the rule |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2020-12-08 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Finance |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2019-11-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-19 | House | Passed |
2019-11-14 | House | Reported: Financial Institutions |
2019-09-24 | House | Refer to Committee: Financial Institutions |
2019-07-17 | House | Introduced |