OH HB493 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-15 - line item veto receipt
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-15 - line item veto receipt
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 307.627, 2151.421, 2151.422, 2151.99, 2317.56, 2919.171, 2919.19, 2919.191, 2919.192, 2919.193, 3701.701, 4731.22, 5153.16, 5153.175, and 5153.176; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 2919.191 (2919.192), 2919.192 (2919.194), and 2919.193 (2919.198); and to enact new sections 2919.191 and 2919.193 and sections 2919.195, 2919.196, 2919.197, 2919.199, 2919.1910, and 2919.1911 of the Revised Code to make changes in the child abuse and neglect reporting law, to generally prohibit an abortion of an unborn human individual with a detectable heartbeat, to create the Joint Legislative Committee on Adoption Promotion and Support, and to make an appropriation.
Title
Revises child abuse and neglect reporting law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-15 | House | line item veto receipt |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2016-12-06 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Reported: Civil Justice |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-05-25 | House | Passed |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported - Substitute: Community and Family Advancement |
2016-04-13 | House | Refer to Committee: Community and Family Advancement |
2016-03-21 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
21 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 51 | 421 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 51 | 422 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 51 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 17 | 56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 19 | 171 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 191 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 192 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 193 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
3 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 07 | 627 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 01 | 701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 31 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
51 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 53 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 53 | 175 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 53 | 176 | Amended Code | Citation Text |