OH SB116 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-11-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-11-11 - Effective Date
Summary
To amend section 4141.312 of the Revised Code to specify conditions under which a claimant's unemployment compensation benefits are not reduced by the amount the claimant concurrently receives in social security retirement benefits and to declare an emergency.
Title
Unemployment compensation-no Social Security setoff
Sponsors
Sen. Joy Padgett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-11-11 | Effective Date | |
2007-11-11 | Governor Action | |
2007-11-16 | End of 10-day Period | |
2007-11-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2007-05-01 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2007-05-01 | Committee Report | |
2007-03-14 | To Finance & Financial Institutions | |
2007-03-14 | Introduced to House | |
2007-10-30 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2007-10-18 | Committee Report | |
2007-05-03 | To Finance & Appropriations | |
2007-05-03 | Introduced to Senate |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_SB_116 |