OH SB150 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-20)
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-20)
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 903.25, 905.31, 905.32, 905.34, 905.36, 905.39, 905.41, 905.45, 905.46, 905.47, 905.48, 905.49, 905.50, 905.99, 907.111, 1511.01, 1511.02, 1511.021, 1511.07, 1511.071, 1515.01, 1515.02, 1515.08, 3717.53, 6111.03, 6111.04, and 6111.44; to amend for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses section 905.501 (905.503); and to enact new section 905.501 and sections 905.321, 905.322, 905.323, 905.324, 905.325, 905.502, and 1511.023 of the Revised Code to revise the law governing the abatement of agricultural pollution, to require a person that applies fertilizer for the purposes of agricultural production to be certified to do so by the Director of Agriculture, to make other changes to the Agricultural Additives, Lime, and Fertilizer Law.
Title
To revise the law governing the abatement of agricultural pollution, to require a person that applies fertilizer for the purposes of agricultural production to be certified to do so by the Director of Agriculture, to make other changes to the Agricultural Additives, Lime, and Fertilizer Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-21 | Effective Date | |
2014-05-22 | Governor' Action | |
2014-05-28 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-05-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-05-07 | Concurrence | |
2014-01-22 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-01-22 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-06-25 | To Agriculture | |
2013-06-25 | Introduced to House | |
2014-04-09 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-04-02 | Committee Report* A | |
2014-01-23 | To *Finance and Appropriations | |
2014-01-23 | Introduced to Senate |