OH SB198 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4507.50, 4507.51, 4507.52, 5120.59, and 5139.511 and to enact section 5145.1611 of the Revised Code to provide inmates with state identification cards and documentation upon their release relating to work experience, education, and trade skills.
Title
Provide inmates with state ID cards, education documentation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | House | Introduced |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Passed |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Small Business and Economic Opportunity |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Referred to committee: Small Business and Economic Opportunity |
2023-11-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Prisons
Employment : Workforce Development
Juvenile and Family Law
Public Safety
Senate Small Business and Economic Opportunity Committee
Transportation
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Prisons
Employment : Workforce Development
Juvenile and Family Law
Public Safety
Senate Small Business and Economic Opportunity Committee
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 07 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 07 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 07 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 20 | 59 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 39 | 511 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 45 | 1611 | New Code | See Bill Text |