OH SB200 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3503.11, 3503.15, 3503.18, 3503.21, and 3506.22 of the Revised Code to modify the law governing the statewide voter registration database and the transmission of voter registration information from the Bureau of Motor Vehicles to the Secretary of State and to reduce the minimum required number of direct recording electronic voting machines.
Title
To modify the law governing the statewide voter registration database and the transmission of voter registration information from the Bureau of Motor Vehicles to the Secretary of State and to reduce the minimum required number of direct recording electronic voting machines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-11 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - House - Motion laid on table (Vote) (Y: 58 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-30 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Effective Date | |
2013-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2013-12-30 | End of 10-day period | |
2013-12-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2013-12-11 | Concurrence | |
2013-10-30 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-10-30 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-10-02 | To State Government Oversight & Reform | |
2013-10-02 | Introduced to House | |
2013-12-11 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-12-10 | Committee Report | |
2013-10-31 | To Policy and Legislative Oversight | |
2013-10-31 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
35 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 03 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 03 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 03 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 03 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
35 | 06 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |