OH SB200 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Refer to Committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Refer to Committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 5534.25 and 5534.28 of the Revised Code to designate a portion of State Route 7 in Mahoning County as the "Army Chief Warrant Officer Donald V. Clark Memorial Highway" and to designate a portion of I-70 in Franklin county as the "Sergeant Adam L. Knox Memorial Highway."
Title
Designates memorial highway
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Hughes [R] | Sen. Kevin Bacon [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-11-19 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Informally passed |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Informally passed |
2015-11-09 | Senate | Informally passed |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Informally passed |
2015-10-29 | Senate | Informally passed |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Informally passed |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Informally passed |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Informally passed |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Reported: Transportation, Commerce and Labor |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Labor |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
55 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 34 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |