OH SB83 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-10)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference
Pending: House Rules and Reference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Ohio Environmental Protection Agency to conduct brownfield assessments at sites located in this state and to make an appropriation.
Title
Require EPA conduct a study to determine brownfield locations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-08 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | House | Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference |
2021-12-08 | House | Reported - Substitute - Re-referred to Rules and Reference: Agriculture and Conservation |
2021-06-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Conservation |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Environment and Natural Resources
Environment and Natural Resources : Air and Water Pollution Control
Finance and Appropriations
Environment and Natural Resources : Air and Water Pollution Control
Finance and Appropriations