OR HB3041 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination or retaliation against employee who expresses concerns about wage inequity based on sex.
Title
Relating to wage inequity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2013-02-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |