PA HB1264 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-14 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-14 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act regarding the past, present and future response of this Commonwealth to the COVID-19 pandemic; providing for COVID-19 vaccine personal information privacy; and imposing penalties.
Title
Regarding the past, present and future response of this Commonwealth to the COVID-19 pandemic; providing for COVID-19 vaccine personal information privacy; and imposing penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. Clinton Owlett [R] | Rep. James Struzzi [R] | Rep. David Rowe [R] | Rep. Craig Williams [R] |
Rep. Kathy Rapp [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1454, FP (Y: 115 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A938, PISCIOTTANO (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A924, KAIL (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A895, PENNYCUICK (Y: 112 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A894, MOUL (Y: 120 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A893, MOUL (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A887, KLUNK (Y: 111 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A885, LEWIS (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A875, LAWRENCE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A874, MAKO (Y: 113 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A871, GROVE (Y: 189 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A870, ECKER (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A869, PICKETT (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A861, OWLETT (Y: 189 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1454, FP (Y: 115 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A938, PISCIOTTANO (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A924, KAIL (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A895, PENNYCUICK (Y: 112 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A894, MOUL (Y: 120 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A893, MOUL (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A887, KLUNK (Y: 111 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A885, LEWIS (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A875, LAWRENCE (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A874, MAKO (Y: 113 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A871, GROVE (Y: 189 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A870, ECKER (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A869, PICKETT (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1264 PN 1342, 2021 A861, OWLETT (Y: 189 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2021-05-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-05-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (115-86) |
2021-05-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-05 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-05-04 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-03 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |