PA HB1281 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 62 (Procurement) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in contracts for public works, providing for specifications for contracts.
Title
In contracts for public works, providing for specifications for contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1281 PN 2908, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1281 PN 1365, 2021 A3804 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1281 PN 1365, 2021 A3804 (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2022-04-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-03-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-03-30 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-03-29 | House | Removed from table |
2022-02-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-09 | House | First consideration |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |