PA HB135 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on October 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-25 - Act No. 196
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on October 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-25 - Act No. 196
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 22, 1978 (P.L.1166, No.274), referred to as the Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency Law, further providing for definitions, for the Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency, for powers and duties of the commission, for duties of the commission relative to criminal statistics, for duties of public agencies and officers in reporting criminal statistics, for the Juvenile Justice and Delinquency Prevention Committee, for powers and duties of the Juvenile Justice and Delinquency Prevention Committee, for Targeted Community Revitalization and Crime Prevention Advisory Committee and for powers and duties of Targeted Community Revitalization and Crime Prevention Advisory Committee; and providing for justice reinvestment grants.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for the Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency, for powers and duties of the commission, for duties of the commission relative to criminal statistics, for duties of public agencies and officers in reporting criminal statistics, for the Juvenile Justice and Delinquency Prevention Committee, for powers and duties of the Juvenile Justice and Delinquency Prevention Committee, for Targeted Community Revitalization and Crime Prevention Advisory Committee and for powers and duties of Targeted Community Revitalization and Crime Prevention Advisory Committee; and providing for justice reinvestment grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-16 - House - HB 135 PN 4060, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - Senate - HB 135 PN 4060, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-24 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - HB 135 PN 1710, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - Senate - HB 135 PN 4060, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-24 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - HB 135 PN 1710, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-25 | House | Act No. 196 |
2012-10-25 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-10-16 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-10-16 | House | Signed in House |
2012-10-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (195-0) |
2012-10-16 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-10-15 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-10-15 | House | In the House |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2012-09-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-09-24 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2012-06-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-05-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2011-05-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-05-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2011-05-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-05-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-10 | House | Second consideration |
2011-05-09 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-03 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-03 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-03-17 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |