PA HB1434 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for the Dual Credit Innovation and Equity Grant Program.
Title
Providing for the Dual Credit Innovation and Equity Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1434 PN 1613, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 102 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - House - House Education: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1434 PN 1613, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 102 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - House - House Education: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2024-03-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-03-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (102-99) |
2024-03-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-03-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-03-20 | House | Second consideration |
2024-03-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-09-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2023-09-22 | House | Removed from table |
2023-09-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-09-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-27 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2023-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2023-06-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-06-20 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |