PA HB1492 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 76-5)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Public Welfare Code, in public assistance, providing for Pennsylvania-specific health insurance coverage.
Title
In public assistance, providing for Pennsylvania-specific health insurance coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-04 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2014-06-04 | House | First consideration |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-06-11 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |